Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 404 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18207 Week
» 71223 Month
» 190750 Year
» 3217603 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
3429 |
m/e |
05/1903 |
Great Western Railway (1912) |
3377 |
m/e |
12/1912 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
05/1903 |
PENZANCE |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Bulldog |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
137 |
Works Number |
1986 |
To Service |
During 05/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 21/03/1951 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 10 mths , 19 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1903 |
SALOP |
|
Shrewsbury |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
WOS |
|
Worcester |
4w/e |
03/12/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/03/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
WOS |
Worcester |
4w/e |
03/12/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1906 |
Diagram D3 boiler fitted |
04/1913 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1915 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/10/1948 |
Swindon Stock Shed (Newburn Wagon Repair) |
On 21/10 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 3012/14/15/17/18/23/41, 3900/54/55, 4081, 4502, 4914, 4801/06/08/10/51/55/57, 6320 while those observed at the Newburn Wagon Repair Shed were Nos. 3022/24/36, 3377/83/93, 3406/07/44/47/49, 3450/51/54, 3901/03/52, 4803/05/07/09/11/53/54/56, 9024/83/84/89. Nos. 3904/50 an 4804 have been re-converted to coal-burning and re-numbered *4972, 5955 and 2839 respectively. *Still retains electric lighting equipment. |
SLS/194812 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3429, name: PENZANCE Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1986 Diagram D0 boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1906 |
Modification |
Diagram D3 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1912 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3377 |
|
|
04/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (SALOP) |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (WOS) |
|
|
21/03/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3377 |
|
|