Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 822 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18625 Week
» 71641 Month
» 191168 Year
» 3218021 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
3463 |
m/e |
03/1904 |
Great Western Railway (1912) |
3401 |
m/e |
12/1912 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
03/1904 |
VANCOUVER |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Bulldog |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
148 |
Works Number |
2046 |
To Service |
During 03/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 29/11/1949 |
Service Life |
45 yrs , 9 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1904 |
LA |
|
Laira |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
HFD |
|
Hereford |
4w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/11/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1907 |
Diagram D3 boiler fitted |
08/1909 |
Diagram D2 boiler fitted |
11/1911 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1911 |
Diagram D3 boiler fitted |
11/1925 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1945 |
Plymouth Area |
There have been some very heavy trains, especially in the Up direction, the Cornish riviera always being in two parts, with double heading the rule as far as Newton Abbot. It is very pleasing to see so many 4-4-0's on this section of the G.W., those recently noted at North Road being: 3313/54/75/83/91, 3401/30/1/40/1/3/5/6. The Saltash auto-service is worked by four coach auto units with the loco (one of the Laira 64XX pannier tanks) sandwiched in the middle. More normal two coach formations may be used at slack periods. |
SLS/194601 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3463, name: VANCOUVER Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2046 Diagram D2 boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1907 |
Modification |
Diagram D3 boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1909 |
Modification |
Diagram D2 boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1911 |
Modification |
Diagram D3 boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1911 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1912 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3401 |
|
|
11/1925 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Laira (LA) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (HFD) |
|
|
29/11/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3401 |
|
|