Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 601 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6206 Week
» 17753 Month
» 417435 Year
» 494022 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 1369   16/02/1934

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 1366
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 16/02/1934
Withdrawal During 11/1964
Service Life 30 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 05/04/1960
72F Wadebridge 4w/e 27/08/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 24/04/1960
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region m/e 30/04/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1934 To Service To service as GWR Number 1369
Built at Swindon Works
   
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G)    
27/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Wadebridge (72F)    
11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 1369    

prev prev