Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 327 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1193 Week
» 25855 Month
» 284714 Year
» 795816 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D14 24/11/1960
TOPS (Tops) 45015 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 45
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Derby Works
To Service 24/11/1960
Withdrawn 03/03/1986
Time in Service 25 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 24/11/1960
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 24/12/1960
55H Neville Hill w/e 25/02/1961
52A Gateshead w/e 02/09/1961
55H Neville Hill w/e 09/09/1961
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 08/12/1962
   Withdrawn 03/03/1986

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1969 Dual Braked

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
24/11/1960 To Service To service as D14
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
24/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
11/02/1961 Sightings Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
25/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H)    
02/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
09/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
03/1969 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 45015    
03/03/1986 Withdrawn Condemned as 45015    

prev prev