Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 127 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17930 Week
» 70946 Month
» 190473 Year
» 3217326 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D146 |
15/12/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46009 |
05/02/1974 |
|
Departmental (97/4) |
97401 |
|
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
15/12/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
01/10/1983 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys |
Cut Up |
08/1984 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (at Old Dalby (Nuclear Crash Test Site)) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and white bodyside band at base of body. |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
13/02/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/12/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
13/02/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1982 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
02/11/1962 |
Unknown |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
14/12/1963 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
10/05/1970 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
23/09/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
29/10/1970 |
Unknown |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Light engine |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/12/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D146 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
23/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
12/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
12/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
30/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
21/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with small yellow panels and white bodyside band at base of body. |
|
|
13/02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
05/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46009 |
|
|
12/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
1983 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 97401 but not taken up |
|
|
01/10/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46009 |
|
|
08/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Old Dalby (Nuclear Crash Test Site) |
|
|