Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 791 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14197 Week
» 67213 Month
» 186740 Year
» 3213593 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D148 |
22/12/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46011 |
24/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
22/12/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
25/11/1984 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys |
Cut Up |
01/1986 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/12/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/12/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D148 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
10/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
22/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
12/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
28/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
24/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46011 |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
25/11/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46011 |
|
|
01/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|