Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3751 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17157 Week
» 70173 Month
» 189700 Year
» 3216553 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1500 |
28/09/1962 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47401 |
14/11/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/09/1962 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
02/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/12/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/09/1962 |
vd |
Vacuum brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
Webb |
11/12/1970 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
09/1981 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Preservation
Preservation Date |
12/1994 |
Current Status |
Operational |
Status Date |
12/04/2012 |
Information |
Midland Railway Centre |
Link |
www.47401project.co.uk/ |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/09/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1500 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 342 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
01/1963 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
02/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
11/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
23/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
14/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47401 |
|
|
09/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
05/06/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47401 |
|
|