Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 78 Today
» 844 Yesterday
» 4344 Week
» 16122 Month
» 305514 Year
» 816616 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1500 28/09/1962
TOPS (1973) 47401 14/11/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 47
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 342
To Service 28/09/1962
Withdrawn 05/06/1992
Time in Service 29 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34G Finsbury Park (New) 28/09/1962
82C Swindon (on loan) 4w/e 03/11/1962
34G Finsbury Park w/e 08/12/1962
82C Swindon (on loan) m/e 01/1963
34G Finsbury Park w/e 02/03/1963
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 02/11/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 02/05/1964
34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/01/1965
40B Immingham w/e 25/11/1967
34G Finsbury Park w/e 23/01/1971
IM Immingham w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 05/06/1992

Preservation
Preservation Date 12/1994
Current Status Operational
Status Date 12/04/2012
Information Midland Railway Centre
Link www.47401project.co.uk/


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/09/1962 To Service To service as D1500
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 342
Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G)
   
03/11/1962 Allocation Loaned to Swindon (82C)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
01/1963 Allocation Loaned to Swindon (82C)    
02/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
25/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
11/1970 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
23/01/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
11/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 47401    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
05/06/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 47401    

prev prev