Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2027 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19830 Week
» 72846 Month
» 192373 Year
» 3219226 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
(1946) |
8000 |
12/08/1944 |
|
Post 1948 |
15000 |
14/06/1952 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
DES1 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
370 |
Works Number |
1960 |
To Service |
12/08/1944 to Stratford (STR) |
Withdrawn |
05/08/1967 off Crewe South (5B) |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys |
Cut Up |
08/1968 |
Cut At |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
Information |
Was in use as Doncaster Works shunter from 3rd July 1944 |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/08/1944 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/08/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway number D8000 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1960 Allocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
20/06/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 15000 |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
05/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) (loan made permanent) |
|
|
05/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
05/08/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 15000 from Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by R A Kings: Norwich |
|
|