Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 682 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14088 Week
» 67104 Month
» 186631 Year
» 3213484 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
(1946) |
8003 |
22/03/1945 |
|
Post 1948 |
15003 |
24/11/1951 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
DES1 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
370 |
Works Number |
1978 |
To Service |
22/03/1945 to Stratford (STR) |
Withdrawn |
06/05/1967 off Crewe South (5B) |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 1 mth , 14 dys |
Cut Up |
06/1968 |
Cut At |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
Information |
Work started on construction in early 1944 but was by a parts shortage. Trialed at Doncaster Works shunter from February 1945. |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/03/1945 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/03/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway number D8003 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1978 Allocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
20/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
24/11/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 15003 |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
05/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
05/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
06/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 15003 from Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
06/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|