Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 33 Online
» 4491 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20103 Week
» 118748 Month
» 321412 Year
» 3348265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
15104 |
31/05/1948 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/05/1948 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/05/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 15104 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (2C) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
22/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 15104 |
|
|
09/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co.: Chesterfield |
|
|