Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4593 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23504 Week
» 88458 Month
» 291122 Year
» 3317975 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1516 |
10/04/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47417 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
10/04/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
18/10/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/04/1963 |
vd |
Vacuum brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
Webb |
18/10/1969 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Preservation Date |
12/1994 |
Current Status |
Unserviceable |
Status Date |
11/04/2012 |
Link |
www.47401project.co.uk/ |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/04/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1516 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 358 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
18/10/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47417 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
24/02/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47417 |
|
|