Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 74 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4931 Week
» 16636 Month
» 348125 Year
» 424712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1516 10/04/1963
TOPS (1973) 47417 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 47
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 358
To Service 10/04/1963
Withdrawn 24/02/1992
Time in Service 28 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34G Finsbury Park (New) 10/04/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 25/11/1967
55B York (North) w/e 01/11/1969
34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/10/1971
HO Holbeck (MR) w/e 19/05/1973
GD Gateshead 4w/e 06/10/1973
IM Immingham w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 24/02/1992

Preservation
Preservation Date 12/1994
Current Status Unserviceable
Status Date 11/04/2012
Link www.47401project.co.uk/


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
10/04/1963 To Service To service as D1516
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 358
Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G)
   
25/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
31/10/1969 Modification Modification: Dual Braked    
01/11/1969 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
19/05/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO)    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GD)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 47417    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
24/02/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 47417    

prev prev