Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3268 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16674 Week
» 69690 Month
» 189217 Year
» 3216070 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
2 |
30/09/1937 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
15202 |
13/11/1948 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/09/1937 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/09/1937 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway number D2 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation dnapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 15202 |
|
|
30/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (Used to shunt Acton yard.) |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
09/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
13/12/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 15202 |
|
|
05/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|