Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2935 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16341 Week
» 69357 Month
» 188884 Year
» 3215737 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1521 |
07/06/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47001 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
07/06/1963 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
01/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
29/10/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/06/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
29/10/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/06/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1521 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 414 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
29/10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47001 |
|
|
30/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
25/11/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47001 |
|
|
21/01/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|