Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 862 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14268 Week
» 67284 Month
» 186811 Year
» 3213664 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1529 |
05/07/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47007 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
05/07/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
13/11/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/07/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
13/11/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
21/10/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Electrical insulation |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1529 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 422 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Research Department (Derby) (92D) |
|
|
28/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
29/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
28/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
13/11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
24/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47007 |
|
|
27/09/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47007 |
|
|
11/07/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|