Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3882 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17288 Week
» 70304 Month
» 189831 Year
» 3216684 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1532 |
26/07/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47009 |
05/01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
26/07/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
01/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
28/10/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/07/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
28/10/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/1981 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
11/01/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1532 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 425 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
24/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
31/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
14/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
28/10/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
16/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
05/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47009 |
|
|
21/06/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
26/07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
06/09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
01/03/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47009 |
|
|
10/04/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|