Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2823 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16229 Week
» 69245 Month
» 188772 Year
» 3215625 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1533 |
06/08/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47425 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
06/08/1963 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
01/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
26/02/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
16/09/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 05/1976 |
|
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/08/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
26/02/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
16/09/1972 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xdh |
Dual brakes, Dual heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/08/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1533 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 426 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
24/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
26/02/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
16/09/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47425 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
15/12/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47425 |
|
|
04/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Old Oak Common TMD |
|
|