Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3770 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17176 Week
» 70192 Month
» 189719 Year
» 3216572 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1534 |
16/08/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47426 |
01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
16/08/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/08/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/1972 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
14/08/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/08/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1534 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 427 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
04/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47426 |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
15/12/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47426 |
|
|
05/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Old Oak Common TMD |
|
|