Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 2898 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16304 Week
» 69320 Month
» 188847 Year
» 3215700 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1543 |
27/09/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47014 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
27/09/1963 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
14/09/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/09/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
14/09/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/09/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1543 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 436 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
22/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
18/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
03/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
14/09/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47014 |
|
|
05/07/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47014 |
|
|
10/04/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|