Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3875 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17281 Week
» 70297 Month
» 189824 Year
» 3216677 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1552 |
25/01/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47436 |
14/11/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
25/01/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 09/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/01/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
11/1973 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1552 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
19/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
14/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47436 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
09/12/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47436 |
|
|
12/08/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|