Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 544 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18347 Week
» 71363 Month
» 190890 Year
» 3217743 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1557 |
29/02/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47441 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
29/02/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
06/06/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/02/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
06/1973 |
ve |
Vacuum brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
06/06/1973 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xeh |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/02/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1557 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
07/04/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
06/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/06/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47441 |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
15/12/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47441 |
|
|
29/08/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Old Oak Common TMD |
|
|