Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 75 Today
» 1159 Yesterday
» 2309 Week
» 23211 Month
» 23211 Year
» 1244776 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1562 14/03/1964

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 47
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Crewe Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 14/03/1964
Withdrawn 20/06/1971
Withdrawal Reason Fire damage
Time in Service 7 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 01/09/1971
Cut At Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 14/03/1964
41A Tinsley 26/04/1964
34G Finsbury Park w/e 24/10/1964
31B March w/e 09/01/1965
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 11/05/1968
30A Stratford w/e 11/10/1969
   Withdrawn 20/06/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/03/1964 To Service To service as D1562
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
24/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
13/03/1971 Sightings Class 47 No D1562 had been temporarily uprated and was working the 19:30 Liverpool Street - Norwich when, near Haughley Junction north of Stowmarket, there was an explosion in the engine room. D1562 subsequently caught fire and was severely damaged. The force of the explosion caused the bulkhead door to fly off and strike the driver, breaking his arm.
After periods of storage at Ipswich and Crewe Works, the locomotive was condemned and scrapped - it's cabs were retained as spares for future use.
   
20/06/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D1562    
01/09/1971 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev