Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 506 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19417 Week
» 84371 Month
» 287035 Year
» 3313888 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1563 |
04/04/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47446 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
04/04/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
24/04/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/04/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
24/04/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
04/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/04/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1563 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
24/04/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
24/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47446 |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
24/02/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47446 |
|
|
05/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Old Oak Common TMD |
|
|