Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2657 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16063 Week
» 69079 Month
» 188606 Year
» 3215459 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1568 |
28/03/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47451 |
04/11/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/03/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/03/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
11/1973 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xdh |
Dual brakes, Dual heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/03/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1568 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
22/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
28/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
08/09/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CE) |
|
|
11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
04/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47451 |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
24/06/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47451 |
|
|
04/02/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|