Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 113 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17916 Week
» 70932 Month
» 190459 Year
» 3217312 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1569 |
31/03/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47452 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
31/03/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
27/08/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/03/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
08/1973 |
ve |
Vacuum brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
27/08/1973 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
18/07/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/03/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1569 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
23/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CE) |
|
|
08/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
08/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
27/08/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47452 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
16/08/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47452 |
|
|
04/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Old Oak Common TMD |
|
|