Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1573 |
11/04/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47019 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
11/04/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/12/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 05/1976 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/04/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
02/12/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/04/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1573 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
10/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
02/12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47019 |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
03/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Eastleigh Works |
|
|