Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 772 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14178 Week
» 67194 Month
» 186721 Year
» 3213574 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1574 |
25/04/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47454 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
25/04/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/04/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/04/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/04/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/04/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
06/04/1973 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/04/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1574 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
13/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/04/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/04/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
06/04/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47454 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/03/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47454 |
|
|
25/02/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|