Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 951 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18754 Week
» 71770 Month
» 191297 Year
» 3218150 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1582 |
16/05/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47462 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
16/05/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/10/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/05/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
12/10/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
02/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xeh |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/05/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1582 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
24/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
08/09/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47462 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
31/01/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47462 |
|
|
03/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Toton Training Compound |
|
|