23/05/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1583 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
28/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
28/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
02/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
11/03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
17/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
07/04/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47020 |
|
|
24/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
10/07/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
11/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
02/02/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/02/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
02/02/1981 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47556 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
31/12/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47844 |
|
|
01/05/2002 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47844 |
|
|
10/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Crewe Works |
|
|