Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3038 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16444 Week
» 69460 Month
» 188987 Year
» 3215840 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1586 |
25/05/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47463 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
25/05/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
10/06/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/05/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
05/1972 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
10/06/1972 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
01/1976 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
06/06/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/05/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1586 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
07/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
28/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
14/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
10/06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47463 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
05/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
01/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
21/04/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47463 |
|
|
02/12/1996 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Crewe Works |
|
|