Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2687 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16093 Week
» 69109 Month
» 188636 Year
» 3215489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1587 |
27/05/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47464 |
29/12/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
27/05/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
29/12/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
29/12/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
29/12/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/05/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
12/1973 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
29/12/1973 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xoh |
Dual brakes, No heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/05/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1587 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
29/12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
29/12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
29/12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
29/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47464 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
10/04/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
02/10/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47464 |
|
|
11/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|