Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1207 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19010 Week
» 72026 Month
» 191553 Year
» 3218406 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1594 |
16/06/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47468 |
06/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
16/06/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/01/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
30/09/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
07/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/06/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
25/01/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
30/09/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
07/1976 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/06/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1594 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
28/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
22/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
30/09/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47468 |
|
|
05/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
07/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/08/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47468 |
|
|
05/2002 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|