Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2997 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16403 Week
» 69419 Month
» 188946 Year
» 3215799 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1601 |
06/07/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47473 |
01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
06/07/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
01/07/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/07/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/07/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
07/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/07/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
06/1972 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
01/07/1972 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
07/1976 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xeh |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Headlight |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
23/04/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/07/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1601 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
31/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
01/07/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/07/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
01/07/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47473 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
21/09/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
07/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
03/1998 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/06/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47473 |
|
|