Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 404 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18207 Week
» 71223 Month
» 190750 Year
» 3217603 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1603 |
17/07/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47475 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
17/07/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
01/07/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/07/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/07/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
04/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/07/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
06/1972 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
01/07/1972 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
04/1976 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xeh |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/07/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1603 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
01/07/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/07/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
01/07/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47475 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
04/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
31/01/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47475 |
|
|
03/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|