Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1575 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14981 Week
» 67997 Month
» 187524 Year
» 3214377 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1605 |
29/07/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47028 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47559 |
18/11/1980 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
29/07/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
29/03/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1979 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/07/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
29/03/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1979 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
14/05/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/07/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1605 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
16/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47028 |
|
|
08/02/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
08/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
12/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
18/11/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47559 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
01/01/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47559 |
|
|
01/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|