Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 608 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14014 Week
» 67030 Month
» 186557 Year
» 3213410 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1605 |
on |
01/11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
16xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
381 |
To Service |
Tue 01/11/1949 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 27/02/1962 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 3 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
30/11/1949 |
1STALLOC |
SHL |
Southall |
m/e |
31/01/1950 |
ALLOC |
85A |
Worcester |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
28/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/11/1949 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1605 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
02/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
27/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1605 |
|
|
05/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|