Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1892 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19695 Week
» 72711 Month
» 192238 Year
» 3219091 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D161 |
31/03/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46024 |
30/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
31/03/1962 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
16/04/1978 off Laira (LA) |
Reason for Withdrawal |
Collision damage |
Time in Service |
16 yrs , 16 dys |
Cut Up |
10/1978 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Derby) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/03/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/03/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D161 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
08/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46024 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
16/04/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46024 |
|
|
10/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|