Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1711 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19514 Week
» 72530 Month
» 192057 Year
» 3218910 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1612 |
21/08/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47479 |
26/10/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
21/08/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/01/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
26/10/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
26/10/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
25/06/1977 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/08/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
25/01/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
26/10/1973 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
25/06/1977 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/08/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1612 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
21/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
13/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
26/10/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
26/10/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
26/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47479 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
25/06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
11/12/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47479 |
|
|
06/08/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|