29/08/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1616 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
22/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
29/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
08/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
18/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
10/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
09/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
26/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47480 |
|
|
16/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
31/10/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 97480 |
|
|
02/07/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47971 |
|
|
01/03/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47971 |
|
|
11/2001 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|