Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2260 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20063 Week
» 73079 Month
» 192606 Year
» 3219459 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1618 |
05/09/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47037 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47563 |
14/01/1980 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47831 |
12/05/1989 |
|
TOPS (57/3) |
57310 |
30/08/2003 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
05/09/1964 to Toton (16A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
05/09/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
14/03/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/09/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
14/03/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
26/02/1970 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Light engine |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1618 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
21/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
29/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
03/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
08/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
24/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
14/03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47037 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
14/01/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47563 |
|
|
12/05/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47831 |
|
|
30/08/2003 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57310 |
|
|