Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3110 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16516 Week
» 69532 Month
» 189059 Year
» 3215912 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1620 |
17/09/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47039 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47565 |
16/11/1980 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
17/09/1964 to Toton (16A) |
Withdrawn |
01/01/2000 |
Time in Service |
35 yrs, 3 mths , 15 dys |
Cut Up |
02/2004 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
17/09/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 04/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/09/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 04/1975 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1620 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
18/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
08/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
14/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47039 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
16/11/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47565 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
01/01/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47565 |
|
|
02/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|