Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3394 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16800 Week
» 69816 Month
» 189343 Year
» 3216196 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1625 |
03/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47044 |
04/10/1973 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47567 |
19/10/1980 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
03/10/1964 to Toton (16A) |
Withdrawn |
01/02/2003 |
Time in Service |
38 yrs, 3 mths , 29 dys |
Cut Up |
06/2006 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
03/10/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/10/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/10/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
04/10/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1625 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
07/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
10/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
24/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
04/10/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47044 |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
19/10/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47567 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
01/02/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47567 |
|
|
06/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|