Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1759 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15165 Week
» 68181 Month
» 187708 Year
» 3214561 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1629 |
17/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47047 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47569 |
04/01/1981 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
17/10/1964 to Toton (16A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
17/10/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/07/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/10/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
04/07/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1629 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
27/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
03/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
24/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
04/07/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47047 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
04/01/1981 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47569 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|