Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3116 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16522 Week
» 69538 Month
» 189065 Year
» 3215918 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1630 |
23/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47048 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47570 |
31/10/1980 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47849 |
31/01/1990 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
23/10/1964 to Toton (16A) |
Withdrawn |
01/12/2001 |
Time in Service |
37 yrs, 1 mth , 8 dys |
Cut Up |
05/2002 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
23/10/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/01/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/10/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
04/01/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1630 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
27/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
03/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
15/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
04/01/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CD) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47048 |
|
|
31/10/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47570 |
|
|
31/01/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47849 |
|
|
01/12/2001 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47849 |
|
|
05/2002 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|