10/11/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1634 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
25/09/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
21/10/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
21/10/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
09/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CE) |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CD) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47052 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
30/04/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47052 |
|
|
25/05/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by R Garrett: at Crewe Basford Hall |
|
|