Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3331 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16737 Week
» 69753 Month
» 189280 Year
» 3216133 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1639 |
14/12/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47055 |
05/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47652 |
03/07/1986 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47807 |
10/07/1989 |
|
TOPS (57/3) |
57304 |
30/08/2002 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
14/12/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
01/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/12/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
03/1978 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
11/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/12/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/12/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1973 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
03/1978 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
11/1981 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/12/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1639 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
10/12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
23/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47055 |
|
|
22/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
11/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
03/07/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47652 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
10/07/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47807 |
|
|
30/08/2002 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57304 |
|
|