Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 694 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18497 Week
» 71513 Month
» 191040 Year
» 3217893 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D164 |
19/04/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46027 |
26/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
19/04/1962 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
25/11/1984 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys |
Cut Up |
12/1986 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/04/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
02/05/1964 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
27/08/1970 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/04/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D164 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
20/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
16/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46027 |
|
|
11/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
25/11/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46027 |
|
|
12/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|