Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 2 Online
» 330 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18133 Week
» 71149 Month
» 190676 Year
» 3217529 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1645 |
24/12/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47061 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47649 |
22/05/1986 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47830 |
29/06/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
24/12/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
25/06/1977 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/12/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
25/06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/12/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1645 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
08/09/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47061 |
|
|
07/12/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
10/07/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
25/06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
22/05/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47649 |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
29/06/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47830 |
|
|