Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 489 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18292 Week
» 71308 Month
» 190835 Year
» 3217688 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1647 |
02/01/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47063 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
02/01/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
25/06/1977 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/01/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
25/06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1647 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
28/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47063 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
24/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
05/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
25/06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
22/09/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47063 |
|
|
04/12/1996 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Crewe Works |
|
|